MS HB1267 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Powers And Duties Of The Parole Board; To Amend Section 99-19-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Expunction Of A Felony Record Under Certain Limited Circumstances; To Clarify Authority Of The Court To Revoke Probation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Parole Board; revise powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Jackson (32nd),Bryan,Wiggins |
2015-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Gipson,Campbell,Taylor |
2015-03-26 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-03-02 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: CR To JB |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Corrections;Judiciary, Division B |
2015-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-11 | House | Passed |
2015-02-11 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-02-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-02-03 | House | DR - TSDPCS: CN To JB |
2015-02-03 | House | DR - TSDPCS: JB To CN |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary B;Corrections |