MS HB1047 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 11-46-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Employees Of And Members Of The Mississippi Charter School Authorizer Board Within The Scope Of Protection From Claims Under The Tort Claims Act And Members Of The Personal Service Contract Review Board; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tort Claims Act; include MS Charter School Authorizer Board and Personal Service Contract Review Board.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 88 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 99 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 88 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 99 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Vetoed | |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Doty,Frazier |
2015-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Baker,Reynolds,Powell |
2015-03-12 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2015-02-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-04 | House | Passed |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |