MS HB1023 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-1-87, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Fraud Investigators To Drive Unmarked Vehicles; And For Related Purposes.
Title
DHS Fraud Investigators; allow to drive unmarked vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Horan [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2024-03-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Passed |
2024-03-14 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-03-13 | House | Read the Third Time |
2024-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-28 | House | Recommitted to Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |