MO SCR31 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the United States Congress and the President of the United States to reauthorize the Terrorism Risk Insurance Program
Title
Urges the United States Congress and the President of the United States to reauthorize the Terrorism Risk Insurance Program
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] | Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | H adopted |
2014-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Hearing Conducted H Insurance Policy Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred H Insurance Policy Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported to the House |
2014-03-13 | Senate | S adopted |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | S Offered |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=29478034 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR31.pdf |