MO SCR26 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes independent certified public accountant or certified public accounting firm to conduct an audit of State Auditor's office
Title
Authorizes independent certified public accountant or certified public accounting firm to conduct an audit of State Auditor's office
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SCR 26 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SCR 26 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SCR 26 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | H adopted |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-11 | House | H Second Read |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported to the House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | S adopted |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-04-18 | Senate | S Offered--SCR 26-Kehoe |