MO SCR22 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-05-16 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urges the National Park Service to not take action on the Ozark National Scenic Riverways general management plan, and for the Department of the Interior to negotiate the return of the Ozark National Scenic Riverways to the state

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges the National Park Service to not take action on the Ozark National Scenic Riverways general management plan, and for the Department of the Interior to negotiate the return of the Ozark National Scenic Riverways to the state

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-16HouseH adopted
2014-05-05HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-05-05HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-28HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-28HouseReported Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-04-24HouseVoted Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-04-17HouseHearing Conducted H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-04-01HouseReferred H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
2014-02-20SenateReported to the House
2014-02-20SenateS adopted
2014-02-20SenateSS S offered & adopted (Cunningham)--(5305S.03F)
2014-02-19SenateReported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor
2014-02-04SenateVoted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-01-28SenateHearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-01-16SenateSecond Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-01-15SenateS Offered--SCR 22-Cunningham and Libla

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback