MO SB89 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to transportation
Title
Enacts provisions relating to transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2021-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2021-05-12 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2021-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-04-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation |
2021-04-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation |
2021-04-21 | House | Hearing Conducted H Transportation |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred H Transportation |
2021-03-08 | House | H Second Read |
2021-03-04 | House | H First Read |
2021-03-04 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Perfected |
2021-03-01 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Wieland)--(1040S.03F) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |