MO SB619 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 619-Nieves, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 619-Nieves, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies how courts may rule in contractual disputes involving the law of other countries and jurisdictional issues involving other countries
Title
Specifies how courts may rule in contractual disputes involving the law of other countries and jurisdictional issues involving other countries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 619-Nieves, with SCS |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-03-25 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee - (4387S.02C) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 619-Nieves |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |