MO SB613 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-05-16 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to firearms

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to firearms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-16HouseH Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
2014-03-10HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-03-10HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-03-06HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-03-06HouseReported Do Pass H General Laws Committee
2014-03-06HouseVoted Do Pass H General Laws Committee
2014-03-06HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws Committee
2014-03-04HouseReferred H General Laws Committee
2014-02-24HouseH Second Read
2014-02-20HouseH First Read
2014-02-20SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-02-18SenateReported Truly Re-Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2014-02-17SenateRe-Perfected
2014-02-17SenateSCS, as amended, S adopted
2014-02-17SenateSA 5 to SCS, as amended, S defeated
2014-02-17SenateMotion to reconsider the vote by which SA 5 to SCS, as amended, was adopted - S adopted
2014-02-17SenateMotion to reconsider adoption vote for SCS, as amended - S adopted
2014-02-17SenateMotion to reconsider Perfection Vote - S Adopted
2014-02-13SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2014-02-11SenatePerfected
2014-02-11SenateSCS, as amended, adopted
2014-02-11SenateSA 7 to SCS S offered & defeated (Sifton)--(4538S04.17S)
2014-02-11SenateSA 6 to SCS S offered & defeated (Sifton)--(4538S04.23S)
2014-02-11SenateSA 5 to SCS, as amended, S adopted
2014-02-11SenateSA 1 to SA 5 to SCS S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(4538S04.28S)
2014-02-11SenateSA 5 to SCS S offered (Nasheed)--(4538S04.24S)
2014-02-11SenateSA 4 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schaaf)--(4538S04.14S)
2014-02-11SenateSA 3 to SCS S offered & adopted (Lager)--(4538S04.15S)
2014-02-11SenateSA 2 to SCS, as amended, S adopted
2014-02-11SenateSA 1 to SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Holsman)--(4538S04.27S)
2014-02-10SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-02-10SenateSA 2 to SCS S offered (Holsman)--(4538S04.06S)
2014-02-10SenateSA 1 to SCS S withdrawn
2014-02-10SenateSA 1 to SA 1 to SCS S offered & withdrawn (Schaaf)--(4538S04.16S)
2014-02-10SenateSA 1 to SCS S offered (Sifton)--(4538S04.11S)
2014-02-04SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-01-30SenateReported from S General Laws Committee to Floor w/SCS
2014-01-28SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (4538S.04C)
2014-01-28SenateHearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
2014-01-21SenateHearing to be Continued S General Laws Committee
2014-01-16SenateSecond Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 613-Nieves, et al
2013-12-06SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback