MO SB344 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee (0243S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee (0243S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to earnings tax
Title
Modifies provisions relating to earnings tax
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Razer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee (0243S.02C) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled |