MO SB305 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 305-Kehoe, et al, with SS, SA 3 & SA 1 to SA 3 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 305-Kehoe, et al, with SS, SA 3 & SA 1 to SA 3 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to lobbyist expenditures
Title
Modifies provisions relating to lobbyist expenditures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 305-Kehoe, et al, with SS, SA 3 & SA 1 to SA 3 (pending) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-05-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 3 to SS S offered (Dixon)--(1412S16.41S) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | SA 3 to SS S offered (Dixon)--(1412S16.29S) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S withdrawn |
2017-05-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 2 to SS S offered (Onder)--(1412S16.34S) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered (Schaaf)--(1412S16.33S) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S withdrawn |
2017-05-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SS S offered (Onder)--(1412S16.14S) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Schaaf)--(1412S16.01S) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | SS S offered (Kehoe)--(1412S.16F) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-01-17 | Senate | S First Read--SB 305-Kehoe, et al |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57629290 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB305.pdf |