MO SB155 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-28 - Hearing Conducted H Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-28 - Hearing Conducted H Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Neighborhood Watch Fund for the creation of neighborhood watch organizations throughout the state
Title
Creates the Neighborhood Watch Fund for the creation of neighborhood watch organizations throughout the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Hearing Conducted H Local Government |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred H Local Government Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-16 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee to Floor |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 155-Nasheed |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled |