MO HB53 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred: Local Government(H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred: Local Government(H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires new city council members to receive training and orientation
Title
Requires new city council members to receive training and orientation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB53&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0053I.PDF |