MO HB501 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires course materials relating to sexual education to contain information regarding sexual predators, online predators, and the consequences of inappropriate text messaging
Title
Requires course materials relating to sexual education to contain information regarding sexual predators, online predators, and the consequences of inappropriate text messaging
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - HB 501 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 140 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 33 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 14, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S) |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-07 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-16 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues in Education(H) |
2015-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |