MO HB436 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on July 5 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-09-11 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Second Amendment Preservation Act which rejects all federal acts that infringe on a Missouri citizens' rights under the Second Amendment of the United States Constitution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Second Amendment Preservation Act which rejects all federal acts that infringe on a Missouri citizens' rights under the Second Amendment of the United States Constitution

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-11HouseSenate Message (S)
2013-09-11HouseFailed to Pass over Veto (S)
2013-09-11HouseFailed to Pass over Veto (S)
2013-09-11HouseHouse Message (H)
2013-09-11HouseHouse Votes to Override Veto (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 49 PRESENT: 3
2013-09-11HouseHouse Votes to Override Veto (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 49 PRESENT: 3
2013-07-05HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2013-07-05HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2013-07-05HouseVetoed by Governor (G)
2013-05-22HouseDelivered to Governor
2013-05-22HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2013-05-22HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2013-05-08HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 116 NOES: 38
2013-05-08HouseHouse Concurs (H) - SCS AS AMEMDED ADOPTED AYES: 116 NOES: 38
2013-05-02SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS AS AMENDED
2013-05-02SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED AYES: 26 NOES: 6
2013-05-02SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2013-05-02SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2013-04-29SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2013-04-29SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2013-04-25SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2013-04-24SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
2013-04-24SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2013-04-23SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 24, 2013, 2:00PM, SCR 2
2013-04-23SenateSecond read and referred: Senate General Laws(S)
2013-04-22HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2013-04-18HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 115 NOES: 41
2013-04-18HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2013-04-17HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 1 TO HA 4, HA 4 AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 117 NOES: 39
2013-04-17HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2013-04-17HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2013-04-11HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2013-04-11HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2013-04-11HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2013-04-09HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2013-04-09HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2013-04-09HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2013-04-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2013-03-06HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2013-02-18HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2013-02-06HouseRead Second Time (H)
2013-02-05HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback