MO HB302 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Reported Do Not Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Reported Do Not Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a Blue Alert System
Title
Establishes a Blue Alert System
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - House - House: HB 302 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: HB 302 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 45 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - House - House: HB 302 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 45 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Reported Do Not Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-12 | House | Voted Do Not Pass (H) |
2017-05-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS#2 as amended |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - voted do pass |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | SS Withdrawn (S) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, adopted/SA 5, SS for SCS as amended pending |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-09 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 9, 2017, 8:00am, Senate Lounge |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-02-16 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-16 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-14 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2017-02-14 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-02-14 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-01-31 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |