MO HB265 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Referred: Health Insurance(H)
Pending: House Health Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Referred: Health Insurance(H)
Pending: House Health Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts the Medical Practice Freedom Act which prohibits state licensure of physicians, chiropractors, optometrists, and dentist to be conditioned on participation in any public or private health insurance
Title
Enacts the Medical Practice Freedom Act which prohibits state licensure of physicians, chiropractors, optometrists, and dentist to be conditioned on participation in any public or private health insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Referred: Health Insurance(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB265&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0265I.PDF |