MO HB264 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-22 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-22 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits state or local government cooperation with federal collection of electronic or metadata without a warrant, with exceptions
Title
Prohibits state or local government cooperation with federal collection of electronic or metadata without a warrant, with exceptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB264&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0264I.PDF |