MO HB254 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the physical taking or attempted physical taking of property owned or in the custody of a financial institution
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the physical taking or attempted physical taking of property owned or in the custody of a financial institution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - HB 254 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 133 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - HB 254 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 120 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - HB 254 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 120 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, May 7, 2015, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-05-04 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 21, 2015, 12:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 20 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 120 NOES: 20 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-17 | House | Prefiled (H) |