MO HB2436 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the offense of making a terrorist threat
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the offense of making a terrorist threat
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2024-01-18 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |