MO HB241 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds vehicles owned and operated by the Civil Support Team of the Missouri National Guard when used during operations involving hazardous materials to the definition of "emergency vehicle"
Title
Adds vehicles owned and operated by the Civil Support Team of the Missouri National Guard when used during operations involving hazardous materials to the definition of "emergency vehicle"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - HB 241 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 22, 2015, 8:15am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-02-12 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 155 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-12 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Social Services(H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-16 | House | Prefiled (H) |