MO HB238 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that corrections officers are to receive hazardous duty pay in addition to their regular salary
Title
Provides that corrections officers are to receive hazardous duty pay in addition to their regular salary
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred: Corrections(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-16 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB238&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0238I.PDF |