MO HB2010 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATION BILL
Title
APPROPRIATION BILL
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [PASS]
House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - CANCELLED - Friday, April 26, 2024, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - CANCELLED - Thursday, April 25, 2024, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 24, 2024, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 23, 2024, 1:30 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Appropriations(S) |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 98 NOES: 40 PRESENT: 14 |
2024-04-04 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-04-02 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 7, HA 8, HA 9, HA 10, HA 11, HA 14, HA 15, HA 16, HA 17, HA 21, adopted. |
2024-04-02 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2024-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2024-04-02 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 21, adopted. |
2024-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2024-04-02 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2024-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2024-04-02 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 7, HA 8, HA 9, HA 10, HA 11, HA 14, HA 15, HA 16, HA 17, adopted. |
2024-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2024-04-02 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, adopted. |
2024-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2024-04-02 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 2, adopted. |
2024-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2024-04-02 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1, adopted. |
2024-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2024-04-02 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2024-04-02 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-03-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - with a time limit of six hours of debate on Perfection pursuant to Rule 24(4)(d). AYES: 28 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 5 |
2024-03-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2024-02-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |