MO HB2010 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Mental Health, Board of Public Buildings, and Department of Health and Senior Services
Title
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Mental Health, Board of Public Buildings, and Department of Health and Senior Services
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Stream [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-09-10 | Senate | Passed over Veto (G) - Senate concurred in line item vetoes to CCS SCS HCS HB 2010 |
2014-09-10 | Senate | Taken Up |
2014-09-10 | House | Reported to The Senate (S) |
2014-09-10 | House | Passed over Veto (G) - Section 10.110 for ex-offender treatment services; Section 10.410 for an autism spectrum disorder clinic; Section 10.410 for regional autism projects; Section 10.710 for epilepsy education; Section 10.710 for the Elks mobile dental program; Section 10.710 for a traumatic brain injury Medicaid waiver; Section 10.725 for the Missouri Area Health Education Centers Program; Section 10.740 for the expansion of newborn screening services; Section 10.820 for Alzheimer's grants; Section 10.825 for congregate and home-delivered meals. |
2014-09-10 | House | Taken Up |
2014-06-24 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-06-24 | House | Vetoed in Part by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-08 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 26 NOES: 5 |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 26 NOES: 5 |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2014-05-08 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-08 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 107 NOES: 42 |
2014-05-08 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 43 |
2014-05-08 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-05-07 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2014-05-05 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-01 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES STREAM, FLANIGAN, ALLEN, KIRKTON, LAFAVER |
2014-05-01 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-01 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS SCHAEFER, SILVEY, BROWN, CURLS, WALSH |
2014-05-01 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2014-05-01 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-04-30 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SCS |
2014-04-30 | House | Taken Up |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 26 NOES: 6 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 23, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Tuesday, April 22, 2014, 12:00pm, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Tuesday, April 15, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Thursday, April 17, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Tuesday, April 15, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Appropriations Hearing Canceled for Thursday, April 10, and Friday, April 11, 2014. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 9, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2; Thursday, April 10, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2; Friday, April 10, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2. Mark-up. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 7, 2014, 1:00pm, Senate Committee Room 2; Tuesday, April 8, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S) |
2014-03-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 99 NOES: 52 |
2014-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1 adopted |
2014-03-25 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | Laid Over (H) - ha 1 adopted |
2014-03-25 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit (H) - six hours of total debate on Perfection |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |