MO HB2003 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS BILL
Title
APPROPRIATIONS BILL
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-08 - House - House: HB 2003 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 116 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - House - House: HB 2003 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 115 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House: HB 2003 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House: HB 2003 (*HA 1) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 38 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2020-05-08 - House - House: HB 2003 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 115 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House: HB 2003 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House: HB 2003 (*HA 1) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 38 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2020-06-30 | House | Vetoed in Part by Governor (G) |
2020-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2020-05-08 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2020-05-08 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 24 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-08 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 25 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-08 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2020-05-08 | House | House Message (H) |
2020-05-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 115 NOES: 31 PRESENT: 2 |
2020-05-08 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 116 NOES: 32 PRESENT: 3 |
2020-05-08 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2020-05-07 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2020-05-07 | House | House Message (H) |
2020-05-07 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES SMITH, WOOD, BLACK(7), KENDRICK, BURNETT |
2020-05-07 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2020-05-06 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - HEGEMAN, HOUGH, ROWDEN, ARTHUR, NASHEED |
2020-05-06 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2020-05-06 | House | House Message (H) |
2020-05-06 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference |
2020-05-06 | House | Taken Up |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 26 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-05 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2020-05-04 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-01 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-01 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Second read and referred: Appropriations(S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Appropriations pending referral - Saturday, May 2, 2020, 9:30 AM, Senate Chamber |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Appropriations pending referral - Friday, May 1, 2020, 9:30 AM, Senate Chamber |
2020-04-29 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-04-29 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 106 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 1 |
2020-04-29 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-04-27 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-04-27 | House | HS Adopted in House (H) |
2020-04-27 | House | Taken Up |
2020-04-27 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2020-04-27 | House | Taken Up |
2020-04-27 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2020-04-27 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-04-27 | House | House Substitute Offered (H) |
2020-04-27 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-04-24 | House | House Substitute Distributed |
2020-03-16 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - Six hours total debate on perfection. AYES: 30 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |