MO HB1853 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a vasectomy from being performed on a man unless it is to prevent the death or to avert serious risk of substantial and irreversible physical impairment of a major bodily function of the man
Title
Prohibits a vasectomy from being performed on a man unless it is to prevent the death or to avert serious risk of substantial and irreversible physical impairment of a major bodily function of the man
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-10 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred: Special Stand Com on Governmental Affairs (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1853&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1853I.htm |