MO HB1764 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-03 - SEE COMMENTS
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-03 - SEE COMMENTS
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits persons, employers, or health care providers from being compelled to participate in any health care system and allows certain domestic insurance companies to dissolve under certain conditions
Title
Prohibits persons, employers, or health care providers from being compelled to participate in any health care system and allows certain domestic insurance companies to dissolve under certain conditions
Sponsors
Rep. John Diehl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-03 | SEE COMMENTS | |
2010-05-25 | Ballot Issue (H) - REFERENDUM CLAUSE PROHIBITING PERSONS, EMPLOYERS, HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS BEING COMPELLED TO PARTICI- PATE IN HEALTH CARE SYSTEM & CERTAIN DOMESTIC INS.COMPANIES TO DISSOLVE UNDER CERTAIN CIRCUMSTANCES. | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-11 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 108 NOES: 47 | |
2010-05-11 | House Concurs (H) - SS ADOPTED AYES: 108 NOES: 48 | |
2010-05-04 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SS | |
2010-05-04 | Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 26 NAYS: 8 | |
2010-05-04 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2010-05-04 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-05-03 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-04-22 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-20 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-04-20 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-13 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Read and Referred: Small Business, Insurance, and Industry (S) | |
2010-03-31 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-31 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-30 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-18 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-03-17 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Referred: Insurance Policy (H) | |
2010-01-25 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-21 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |