MO HB1730 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to the food pantry tax credit
Title
Modifies provisions related to the food pantry tax credit
Sponsors
Rep. Phil Amato [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Public Policy(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |