MO HB151 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of revenue to issue REAL ID compliant driver's licenses unless the applicant requests a license that is not compliant with the REAL ID Act
Title
Requires the department of revenue to issue REAL ID compliant driver's licenses unless the applicant requests a license that is not compliant with the REAL ID Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: HB 151 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 97 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: HB 151 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 108 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: HB 151 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 112 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: HB 151 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 117 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: HB 151 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 40 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: HB 151 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 19 N: 125 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House: HB 151 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 45 N: 101 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House: HB 151 (*HA 5) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 21 N: 119 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House: HB 151 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: HB 151 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 108 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: HB 151 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 112 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: HB 151 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 117 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: HB 151 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 40 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: HB 151 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 19 N: 125 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House: HB 151 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 45 N: 101 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House: HB 151 (*HA 5) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 21 N: 119 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House: HB 151 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2017-06-12 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-05-22 | House | Constitutional Objection Filed (S) |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-05-11 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 108 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 5 |
2017-05-11 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 112 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 2 |
2017-05-11 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS#2 HCS HB 151 as amended AYES: 117 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 1 |
2017-05-11 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-05-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS#2 as amended |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | SS Withdrawn (S) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 24, 2017, 3:00 p.m., Bingham Conference Room |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Hearing rescheduled |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Friday, April 21, 2017, 8:00am, Bingham Conference Room |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) - Thursday, April 6, 2017, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Veterans’ and Military Affairs(S) |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-03-30 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 19 NOES: 125 PRESENT: 8 |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 99 NOES: 40 PRESENT: 8 |
2017-03-30 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 1 to HA 2, HA 2 as amended, HA 1 to HA 4, HA 4 as amended adopted |
2017-02-21 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To - Relating to driver's licenses compliant with the Federal Real ID Act of 2005, with an emergency clause |
2017-02-21 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-21 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred: Government Efficiency(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |