MO HB1470 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Referred: Select Committee on Utilities(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Referred: Select Committee on Utilities(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Interstate Power Compact" to protect member states' sovereignty and assurances granted under the Tenth Amendment with regard to the prevention and control of air pollution
Title
Creates the "Interstate Power Compact" to protect member states' sovereignty and assurances granted under the Tenth Amendment with regard to the prevention and control of air pollution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Utilities(H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred: Energy and the Environment(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1470&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1470I.PDF |