MO HB10 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Mental Health, Board of Public Buildings, and Department of Health and Senior Services
Title
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Mental Health, Board of Public Buildings, and Department of Health and Senior Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 41 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 98 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 98 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: HB 10 (*HA 5) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 39 N: 107 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 98 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 98 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: HB 10 (*HA 5) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 39 N: 107 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2017-06-30 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-05-08 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-05-04 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 22 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 22 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-04 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-05-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 98 NOES: 57 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 98 NOES: 56 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Substitute Motion Defeated |
2017-05-04 | House | Substitute Motion Offered |
2017-05-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-03 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2017-05-01 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-05-01 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS BROWN, SATER, CUNNINGHAM, CURLS, NASHEED |
2017-05-01 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-04-27 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES FITZPATRICK, ALFERMAN, WOOD, LAVENDER, QUADE |
2017-04-27 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-04-27 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2017-04-26 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-04-26 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SCS |
2017-04-26 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 24 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) - AYES: 24 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 4 and SCS pending |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-24 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 19, 2017, 8:30am, SCR 2 |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 106 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA2 adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-04-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 2 adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | SEE COMMENTS - Six (6) hours total debate on perfection, pursuant to HR 1400 |
2017-04-03 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2017-04-03 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 31 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2017-02-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |