MN SF5153 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2609
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2609
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Bureau of Criminal Apprehension and Violent Crime Enforcement Teams gun trafficking investigations and firearms seizures report requirement, trigger activator definition modification, and penalties increase for transferring certain firearms to persons who are ineligible to possess firearms
Title
Bureau of Criminal Apprehension and Violent Crime Enforcement Teams gun trafficking investigations and firearms seizures report requirement, trigger activator definition modification, and penalties increase for transferring certain firearms to persons who are ineligible to possess firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2609 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2609 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Second reading