MN SF3719 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Agricultural Fertilizer Research and Education Council extension and agricultural fertilizer research and education account fee creation
Title
Minnesota Agricultural Fertilizer Research and Education Council extension and agricultural fertilizer research and education account fee creation
Sponsors
Sen. Aric Putnam [D] | Sen. Bill Weber [R] | Sen. Heather Gustafson [D] | Sen. Rob Kupec [D] |
Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Author added Westrom |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Broadband, and Rural Development |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3411 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Author added Frederick