MN SF2 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Senate file first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Senate file first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Peacetime emergency authority elimination of governor's authority to use peacetime emergency restrictions on schools authorization
Title
Peacetime emergency authority elimination of governor's authority to use peacetime emergency restrictions on schools authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Roger Chamberlain [R] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] |
Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2021-02-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Special Order |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Education Finance and Policy |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Author added Eichorn |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Authors added Draheim; Duckworth |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Author stricken Rest |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1051 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Author added Robbins