MN SF1242 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Author added Drazkowski
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Author added Drazkowski
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Definition modification of attachments and appurtenances of cooperative utility distribution lines
Title
Definition modification of attachments and appurtenances of cooperative utility distribution lines
Sponsors
Sen. Aric Putnam [D] | Sen. Grant Hauschild [D] | Sen. Bill Weber [R] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | Senate | Author added Drazkowski |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1171 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Author added Robbins