MN HF799 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-05-07 - Motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote enacted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote enacted.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-08 - Passage (Y: 62 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-07HouseMotion prevailed
2014-05-07HouseMotion to lay on the table
2014-05-05HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 7, 2014
2014-05-05HouseSecond reading
2014-05-05HouseJoint rule 2.03 waived
2014-05-05HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2014-02-25HouseAuthor added Newton
2014-02-25HouseAuthor added Lesch (chief author)
2013-05-09HouseAuthor stricken Bly
2013-05-08HouseMotion prevailed
2013-05-08HouseMotion to re-refer Rules and Legislative Administration
2013-05-08HouseMotion prevailed
2013-05-08HouseMotion for reconsideration passage
2013-05-08HouseBill was not passed vote: 62-71
2013-05-08HouseThird reading
2013-05-06HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 8, 2013
2013-04-10HouseAuthor added Hamilton
2013-03-13HouseAuthor added Freiberg
2013-03-04HouseSecond reading
2013-03-04HouseCommittee report, to pass
2013-02-21HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Elections

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback