CA AB2062 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14400, 14406, 14456, 14651, 14765, 14766, 14804, 14805, 15050, and 15100 of the Financial Code, relating to credit unions.
Title
Credit unions.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2024-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 14400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14456 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14651 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14765 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14766 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14804 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 14805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 15050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 15100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |