MN HF4373 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Smith
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Smith
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Book banning prohibited, public library bill of rights established, eligibility requirements modified for various library state aids, and private right of action created and attorney general enforcement provided.
Title
Book banning prohibited, public library bill of rights established, eligibility requirements modified for various library state aids, and private right of action created and attorney general enforcement provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Author added Smith |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2024-03-14 | House | Author added Berg; Hanson, J.; Hollins and Freiberg |
2024-03-13 | House | Author added Lee, F. |
2024-03-11 | House | Author added Curran |
2024-03-07 | House | Authors added Bahner; Coulter; Elkins; Edelson |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |