MN HF4259 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Freiberg
Pending: House Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Freiberg
Pending: House Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property tax provisions modified, and market value exclusion modified for veterans with a disability.
Title
Property tax provisions modified, and market value exclusion modified for veterans with a disability.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Norris [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Rep. Bianca Virnig [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] |
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2024-03-11 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2024-03-04 | House | Authors added Virnig; Stephenson; Xiong |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |