MN HF4182 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Author added Clardy
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Author added Clardy
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Equal Access to Broadband Act established, and broadband services and broadband infrastructure governing provisions modified.
Title
Equal Access to Broadband Act established, and broadband services and broadband infrastructure governing provisions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | House | Author added Clardy |
2024-03-20 | House | Authors added Wolgamott and Carroll |
2024-03-14 | House | Author added Newton |
2024-03-13 | House | Authors added Hemmingsen-Jaeger and Hansen, R. |
2024-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
2024-03-11 | House | Authors added Hanson, J.; and Vang |
2024-03-07 | House | Author added Bahner |
2024-02-28 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Commerce Finance and Policy |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4262 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Author added Dibble