MN HF3941 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Authors added Anderson, P. E., and Pérez-Vega
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Authors added Anderson, P. E., and Pérez-Vega
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Home and community-based services standards modified.
Title
Home and community-based services standards modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Brion Curran [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Heather Keeler [D] | Rep. Bianca Virnig [D] |
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Leigh Finke [D] | Rep. Patti Anderson [R] | Rep. Maria Perez-Vega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Authors added Anderson, P. E., and Pérez-Vega |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance |
2024-02-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3734 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Referred to Human Services