MN HF3647 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Author added Zeleznikar
Pending: House Elections Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Author added Zeleznikar
Pending: House Elections Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Entities or organizations that receive state funding prohibited from making campaign expenditures or otherwise expending money for any political purpose.
Title
Entities or organizations that receive state funding prohibited from making campaign expenditures or otherwise expending money for any political purpose.
Sponsors
Rep. Elliott Engen [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Walter Hudson [R] | Rep. Krista Knudsen [R] |
Rep. Natalie Zeleznikar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Author added Zeleznikar |
2024-02-14 | House | Author added Knudsen |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Elections Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4062 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Referred to Elections