MN HF232 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-24 - Author added Slawik
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-24 - Author added Slawik
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Gold star license plates eligibility expanded to surviving legal guardians, children, and siblings; motor vehicle fees regulated; Department of Veterans Affairs and veteran homes regulated; and driver and vehicle services technology account made permanent.
Title
Gold star license plates eligibility expanded to surviving legal guardians, children, and siblings; motor vehicle fees regulated; Department of Veterans Affairs and veteran homes regulated; and driver and vehicle services technology account made permanent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - House - Repassage, as amended by Conference Committee (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 128 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - House - Amendment (Y: 119 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 128 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - House - Amendment (Y: 119 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-24 | Author added Slawik | |
2011-05-31 | Secretary of State Chapter 117 | |
2011-05-31 | Governor's action Approval | |
2011-05-27 | Presented to Governor | |
2011-05-23 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2011-05-23 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 128-4 |
2011-05-23 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2011-05-23 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2011-05-23 | House | Conference committee report |
2011-05-23 | House | Senate conferees Ingebrigtsen; Senjem; Sparks |
2011-05-23 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2011-05-23 | House | House conferees Kriesel, Howes, Marquart |
2011-05-23 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2011-05-23 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Third reading vote: 63-1 |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Conference committee report |
2011-05-23 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Senate conferees Ingebrigtsen; Senjem; Sparks |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2011-05-23 | Senate | House conferees Kriesel; Howes; Marquart |
2011-05-23 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2011-05-22 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2011-05-22 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2011-05-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-05-21 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF179 |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2011-05-20 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 128-6 |
2011-05-20 | House | Third reading as amended |
2011-05-20 | House | Amended |
2011-05-18 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-13 | House | Author added Morrow |
2011-05-12 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-03 | House | Second reading |
2011-05-03 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2011-03-03 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Transportation Policy and Finance |
2011-02-02 | House | Author added Atkins |
2011-01-31 | House | Author added Lohmer |
2011-01-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Services Division |