MN HF2073 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 41
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 41
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education finance and policy bill.
Title
Higher education finance and policy bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 34 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill (Y: 34 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2073 (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 69 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: McDonald - Amendment - H2073A7 (Y: 58 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Nash - Amendment - H2073A6 (Y: 58 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Robbins - Amendment - H2073A4 (Y: 58 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill (Y: 34 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2073 (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 69 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: McDonald - Amendment - H2073A7 (Y: 58 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Nash - Amendment - H2073A6 (Y: 58 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Robbins - Amendment - H2073A4 (Y: 58 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 41 | |
2023-05-24 | Governor's action Approval | |
2023-05-24 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2023-05-24 | Governor approval | |
2023-05-23 | Presented to Governor | |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Third reading |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2023-05-10 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2023-05-10 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2023-05-09 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2023-05-09 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2023-05-09 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2023-05-09 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate conferees Fateh; Oumou Verbeten; Putnam |
2023-04-25 | House | Senate conferees Fateh; Oumou Verbeten; Putnam |
2023-04-25 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2023-04-19 | Senate | House conferees Pelowski; Wolgamott; O'Neill |
2023-04-19 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2023-04-18 | House | House conferees Pelowski, Wolgamott, O'Neill |
2023-04-18 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2023-04-18 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-04-12 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2023-04-12 | House | Third reading as amended |
2023-04-12 | House | Amended |
2023-04-11 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 12, 2023 |
2023-04-04 | House | Second reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2023-04-03 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2023-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
Same As/Similar To
SF2075 (Similar To) 2023-04-11 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance