MN HF1054 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 74 05/14/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Civil marriage between two persons, exemptions, and protections based on religious association provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil marriage between two persons, exemptions, and protections based on religious association provided.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-09 - Passage, as amended (Y: 75 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Amendment (Y: 22 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-15 Secretary of State Chapter 74 05/14/13
2013-05-14 Governor's action Approval
2013-05-14 Secretary of State, Filed
2013-05-14 Governor approval
2013-05-14HouseReturned from Senate
2013-05-13 Presented to Governor
2013-05-13SenateThird reading Passed vote: 37-30
2013-05-13SenateSpecial Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
2013-05-10SenateSecond reading
2013-05-10SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF925
2013-05-10HouseAuthor added Bernardy
2013-05-09SenateReferred to Rules and Administration
2013-05-09SenateIntroduction and first reading
2013-05-09SenateReceived from House
2013-05-09HouseAuthor added Falk
2013-05-09HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 75-59
2013-05-09HouseThird reading as amended
2013-05-09HouseAmended
2013-05-07HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 9, 2013
2013-05-07HouseSecond reading
2013-05-07HouseCommittee report, to pass
2013-05-06HouseMotion prevailed
2013-05-06HouseMotion to re-refer Ways and Means
2013-05-03HouseAuthors added Liebling and Fischer
2013-03-21HouseAuthor added Johnson, S.
2013-03-18HouseAuthor added Hornstein
2013-03-18HouseSecond reading
2013-03-18HouseCommittee report, to pass as amended
2013-03-11HouseAuthor added Bly
2013-03-04HouseAuthors added Dehn, R.; Paymar; Davnie; Laine; Wagenius and Isaacson
2013-02-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback