MI SB1148 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0490'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0490'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; plant rehabilitation; exception for tax abatements for certain local governmental units; provide for. Amends sec. 9 of 1974 PA 198 (MCL 207.559).
Title
Economic development; plant rehabilitation; exception for tax abatements for certain local governmental units; provide for. Amends sec. 9 of 1974 PA 198 (MCL 207.559).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 874 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 710 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 649 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 710 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 649 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0490'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 1:24 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/27/2012 @ 9:38 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2012 @ 10:14 Am |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Roll Call # 874 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-12 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-06 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 710 Yeas 58 Nays 51 |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-09-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2012-09-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-09-20 | House | Received On 09/20/2012 |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 649 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB5735 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - Printed Bill Filed 06/14/2012