MI SB0998 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 0318'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 0318'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; other; sexual assault evidence kit tracking and reporting act; create. Creates new act.
Title
Law enforcement; other; sexual assault evidence kit tracking and reporting act; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 528 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 551 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 551 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0318'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/14/2014 @ 11:56 Am |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/14/2014 @ 9:40 Am |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/7/2014 @ 3:54 Pm |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-10-02 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-10-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 528 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2014-10-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-10-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-10-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-10-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-10-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-09-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2014-09-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-09-23 | House | Received On 09/23/2014 |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 551 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |
Subjects
Crime victims, other
Crimes, criminal sexual conduct
Criminal procedure, evidence
Law enforcement, investigations
Law enforcement, other
Law enforcement, reports
Law enforcement, state police
State agencies (existing), state police
Crimes, criminal sexual conduct
Criminal procedure, evidence
Law enforcement, investigations
Law enforcement, other
Law enforcement, reports
Law enforcement, state police
State agencies (existing), state police