MI SB0601 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: other; criminal threatening; define and provide penalties for. Amends sec. 147b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.147b).
Title
Crimes: other; criminal threatening; define and provide penalties for. Amends sec. 147b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.147b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 89 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2024-03-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-03-20 | House | Received On 03/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 89 Yeas 20 Nays 15 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Adopted |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3) |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Sylvia Santana |