MI HB5798 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 353'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 353'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; beer; definition of brewpub, fingerprinting requirements, conditional licenses, and brand logoed items; increase number of barrels and clarify. Amends secs. 105, 405, 525 & 609 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1105 et seq.).
Title
Liquor; beer; definition of brewpub, fingerprinting requirements, conditional licenses, and brand logoed items; increase number of barrels and clarify. Amends secs. 105, 405, 525 & 609 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1105 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 606 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 498 (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 498 (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Assigned Pa 353'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-10-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/17/2014 @ 2:41 Pm |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/15/2014 @ 12:08 Pm |
2014-10-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/7/2014 @ 3:08 Pm |
2014-10-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-10-02 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-10-02 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 606 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2014-09-24 | House | Transmitted |
2014-09-24 | House | Title Amended |
2014-09-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 498 Yeas 103 Nays 6 |
2014-09-24 | House | Amended |
2014-09-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-09-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-09-23 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2014-09-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-09-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-09-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-09-16 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/16/2014 |
2014-09-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2014-09-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-09-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Hugh Crawford |
Same As/Similar To
SB1072 (Same As) 2014-09-16 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform