MI HB5750 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on September 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-03 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-03 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; firearms; definition of firearms; modify. Amends sec. 1 of 1952 PA 10 (MCL 752.841).
Title
Weapons; firearms; definition of firearms; modify. Amends sec. 1 of 1952 PA 10 (MCL 752.841).
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Franz [R] | Rep. Gregory MacMaster [R] | Rep. Pat Somerville [R] | Rep. Peter Pettalia [R] |
Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Philip Potvin [R] | Rep. Dale Zorn [R] | Sen. Peter MacGregor [R] |
Rep. Joel Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 572 (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 572 (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-11-12 | House | Transmitted |
2014-11-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 572 Yeas 101 Nays 7 |
2014-11-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-11-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-11-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-10-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-10-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-09-10 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/10/2014 |
2014-09-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-09-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-09-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Ray Franz |